CARERS UK

Charity number: 246329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Colin Michael Harper Trustee 08 October 2020 None on record
Margaret Patricia Dangoor Trustee 11 October 2018
THE FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARY'S HOSPITAL - ROEHAMPTON Received: On time
Flora Scott Martin Trustee 11 October 2018 None on record
Tim Anfilogoff Trustee 18 October 2017 None on record
Siva Shan Trustee 18 October 2017 None on record
Dr Rosie Tope Trustee 13 November 2014 None on record
Nicholas Graham Faraday Baird CMG CVO Trustee 29 June 2020
THE FOUNDATION AND FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL BOTANIC GARDENS,KEW Received: On time
CHELTENHAM LADIES COLLEGE Received: On time
Dr HELEN BROWN Trustee 11 October 2018
RADWINTER RECREATION GROUND CHARITY Received: On time
Eleanor Hester Bradley Trustee 18 October 2017 None on record
Beverley Elizabeth Harden Trustee 11 October 2018 None on record
Virginia Ann Pulbrook Trustee 18 October 2017 None on record
Paula Marie Bryan Trustee 26 November 2015 None on record