Financial history PWLLHELI AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 246476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £725 £1.38k £1.92k £67 £1
Total expenditure £2.09k £3.33k £2.66k £1.34k £62
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A