HATFIELD AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 246689
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 April 2021 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 April 2021 88 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 February 2020 17 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 February 2020 382 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download