Financial history PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST PROPERTY)

Charity number: 246871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £16.34m £14.10m £15.29m £14.21m £14.21m
Total expenditure £16.66m £16.18m £15.54m £14.30m £12.98m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £1.01m
Income - Donations and legacies £13.70m £11.45m £11.37m £10.84m £12.15m
Income - Other trading activities £1.61m £1.52m £1.57m £257.40k £989.54k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £1.60m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £883.38k £842.84k £888.07k £859.17k £953.75k
Income - Other £137.73k £293.65k £1.44m £649.22k £124.28k
Income - Legacies £1.51m £783.03k £442.25k £755.13k £829.27k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.33m £15.76m £15.18m £13.84m £12.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £335.71k £420.20k £359.88k £459.96k £359.90k
Expenditure - Governance £264.59k £201.82k £197.63k £0 £239.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £61.01k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0