PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST PROPERTY)

Charity number: 246871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RT REV PHILIP ANTHONY EGAN BISHOP Chair 11 June 2013
EAST HENDRED CONSOLIDATED CATHOLIC CHARITIES Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
Rev MARK HOGAN Trustee 18 July 2013
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
Rev GERARD DAILLY Trustee 10 December 2015
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
MICHAEL ELKS Trustee 14 September 2017
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
CANON PAUL TOWNSEND Trustee 18 July 2013
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
THE CONGREGATION OF OUR LADY OF PITY Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
Rev JEREMY GARRATT Trustee 20 September 2018
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
MARTIN McCLOSKEY Trustee 29 September 2016
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
CANON Michael Dennehy Trustee 18 July 2013
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
Dr ANTHONY MURPHY Trustee 29 September 2016
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
SUSAN MASSER Trustee 29 September 2016
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
Bernard Davis Trustee 26 September 2019
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
Rev Simon Thomson Trustee 10 December 2015
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time
Rev PAUL JAMES SMITH Trustee 20 September 2018
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST (TRUST FUND) Received: On time
CYMFED Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE PRIESTS RETIREMENT FUND Received: On time