THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 246902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required