THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 246902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £16.24k £21.44k £65.45k £68.27k £19.59k
Total expenditure £40.91k £39.84k £38.59k £84.69k £78.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A