FISONS CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 247009
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 May 1986: Standard registration
  • 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not submitted

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 MARCH 1986
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH A VISITING PROFESSORSHIP AT THE INSTITUTE OF CHILD HEALTH LONDON TO ENABLE IN EACH YEAR A DISTINGUISHED MEDICAL OR NON-MEDICAL SCIENTIST IN A FIELD ALLIED TO PAEDIATRICS TO SPEND A PERIOD OF TIME ATTACHED TO A DEPARTMENT OF THE INSTITUTE TO A DEPARTMENT OF THE INSTITUTE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 13 May 1986 : Standard registration
  • 16 September 2009 : Removed