HALSWAY MANOR SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 247230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Williams Chair 06 October 2013
THE INSTEP RESEARCH TEAM Received: On time
William Crawford Trustee 14 November 2020 None on record
Russ Palmer Trustee 17 September 2015 None on record
Christine Corkett Trustee 06 October 2013 None on record
Gillian Margaret Redmond Trustee 20 July 2021 None on record
Jonathan Peter Webb Trustee 14 October 2019 None on record
Anthony Michael Jon Millyard Trustee 15 October 2018
THE LONDON INTERNATIONAL FESTIVAL OF EARLY MUSIC CIO Recently registered
Timothy Baker Trustee 14 November 2020 None on record
STEPHEN CHARLES EARWICKER Trustee 16 October 2017
THE PURBECK VILLAGE QUIRE TRUST FUND Received: On time
JAMES ROBERTSON Trustee 14 November 2020
STOGUMBER FESTIVAL Received: On time
Colin Teasdale Trustee 14 November 2020 None on record