Accounts and annual returns FEDERATION OF OLD CORNWALL SOCIETIES

Charity number: 247283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 15 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required