Trustees THE ABBEYFIELD KNUTSFORD SOCIETY LTD
Charity number: 247343

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Harvey | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ailsa Parry | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Leyland | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Tilley | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gail Leicester | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Noblet | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Susan Lunney | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Fraser | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT STEPHENS | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA JANE CARTMEL | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.