ALLOTMENT AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity number: 247364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 May 2021 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 July 2018 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required