Trustees BATTERSEA UNITED CHARITIES
Charity number: 247377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP WILLIAM BEDDOWS | Chair | 27 February 2004 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Claire Jean Phipps FCA | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Alexander John Read | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
George Ian Henry Hope Henderson | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Marie Hanson MBE | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Louise Roberta Daisy Calland | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Kate Sutcliffe | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Canon Simon Butler | Trustee | 19 September 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||||
CAROLINE USHER | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
COUNCILLOR TONY BELTON | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
STEPHEN ALAN WILLMETT | Trustee | 25 January 2008 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
TESSA MARY EDWINA STRICKLAND | Trustee | 18 September 2005 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.