WILLIAM ROBERTSON HOMES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of homes as residences for farmers and other agricultural workers in Northumberland, who are incapacitated through old age or infirmity, or who are not less than sixty years of age, who are in need of assistance and who have retired from full employment, and who shall prior to ceasing work have been employed in agriculture in Northumberland for a period of not less than 15 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 29 March 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ELLIOT ROBERTSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mark Brunton | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Wilson | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Anthony Brierley | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN BELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAIN GEORGE ROBERTSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.45k | £31.63k | £32.74k | £59.04k | £48.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.99k | £9.97k | £44.72k | £56.87k | £60.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE HOMES AS RESIDENCES FOR FARMERS AND OTHER AGRICULTURAL WORKERS IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND WHO ARE INCAPACITATED THROUGH OLD AGE OR INFIRMITY, OR WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN SIXTY YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND WHO HAVE RETIRED FROM FULL EMPLOYMENT AND WHO SHALL PRIOR TO CEASING WORK HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN AGRICULTURE IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND FOR A PERIOD OF NOT LESS THAN 15 YEARS.
Area of benefit
NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill Cottage
Felton
MORPETH
NE65 9HL
- Phone:
- 01670787203
- Email:
- snjkerry@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window