Financial history HOBSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 247437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £6.76k £7.07k £6.49k £6.31k £4.58k
Total expenditure £8.23k £8.59k £9.53k £9.59k £9.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A