Trustees THE CHURCH FUND

Charity number: 247465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID HENDERSON Chair 23 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALTON-ON-THAMES
Received: On time
SCOTT CONWAY HAY Trustee 05 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALTON-ON-THAMES
Received: On time
JULIA CAMILLA GORRIE Trustee 20 July 2021
None on record
ANDREW JOHN BERKINSHAW-SMITH Trustee 27 October 2020
None on record
MARTIN JOHN FELSTEAD Trustee 17 September 2019
LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
NIGEL STAPLETON Trustee 31 July 2018
None on record