Trustees 3RD (UNITED KINGDOM) DIVISION WELFARE FUND
Charity number: 247708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colonel Andrew James Charles Geary | Chair | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Major General Micheal Richard Elviss | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Major Kevin Christopher McDonnell | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant Colonel Tracy Wright | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Warrant Officer Class One Anthony Vincent Mills | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.