Trustees SOCIETY FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FAITH
Charity number: 247767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr COLIN JOHN PODMORE MBE | Chair | 19 February 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Edward William Dobson | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
The Revd Canon Paul Geoffrey Harbord | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Vicky Amanda Cole | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
ANNE FIONA MARIA GRAY | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Philip Peter Corbett | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Matthew Thomas Middleton | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
THE REVD CANON ROBERT FAYERS | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew James Carter | Trustee | 06 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
THE REVEREND ANDRE HENRIK HART | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.