THE ABBEY THEATRE TRUST (ST ALBANS) LIMITED

Charity number: 247839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 06 July 2018 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download