Accounts and annual returns NORTHUMBERLAND AND NEWCASTLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 247885
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required