WATKINSON ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 247894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.48k £14.10k £15.25k £15.60k £27.72k
Total expenditure £9.21k £21.51k £13.92k £16.69k £11.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A