Financial history THE MICHAEL MARKS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 248136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £203.22k £210.57k £183.03k £125.01k £127.89k
Total expenditure £154.58k £167.98k £242.40k £35.55k £137.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A