NORFOLK TRUST

Charity number: 252878-11
Linked charity
Governing document
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/03/1871 AS AMENDED ON 30/05/1874 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/1903 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31/03/2011
Charitable objects
FOR CHURCH, SCHOOLS AND BURIAL GROUND. (FOR FULLER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEEDS)
Area of benefit
ROMAN CATHOLIC PARISH OF ARUNDEL (ST. PHILIP NERI)
Registration history
  • 23 November 1966 : registered
Other names
  • THE NORFOLK TRUST - ARUNDEL (Working name)
This charity is a linked charity of