Accounts and annual returns THE DURHAM DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 248287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window