THE JOSEPH AND MARY HILEY TRUST

Charity number: 248301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide small donations (--ú200) to smaller charities in the North of England and sometimes further afield world wide disasters. The RNLI and Action Medical Research receive larger donations in excess of --ú1,000.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £5,421
Total expenditure: £300

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City
  • Calderdale
  • City Of Wakefield
  • Kirklees
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • JOSEPH & MARY HILEY CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Palmer Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LOWER WHARFE
Received: On time
MRS MOLLIE B BROWNING Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH MORRISON HJORT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.27k £4.49k £3.51k £4.13k £5.42k
Total expenditure £9.06k £14.91k £5.01k £4.16k £300
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 24 May 2024 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 March 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Old Coach House
Vicarage Lane
Bramham
Wetherby
LS23 6QG
Phone:
01937842850
Website:

No information available