TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH SERBIAN ORTHODOX PARISH OF ST APOSTLES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
People

8 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derby City
- Leicester City
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 08 August 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDJA ZARAC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BOGDAN ILIC | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOVAN BOROVIC | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS STOYCE | Trustee | 03 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SVETLANA BESEVIC | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEDJELJKO JOVANOVIC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SPASENIJE SUDAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRANKO MIJAKOVAC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.44k | £204.38k | £30.44k | £42.16k | £47.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.93k | £250.58k | £77.79k | £50.35k | £28.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.85k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 27 MARCH 1961
Charitable objects
PREMISES TO BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE SERBIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH
Area of benefit
DERBYS AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 St. Chads Road
Derby
DE23 6RS
- Phone:
- 08715253311
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window