Financial history THE PROTESTANT TRUTH SOCIETY (INC)

Charity number: 248505
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £201.89k £180.69k £179.12k £150.46k £199.47k
Total expenditure £267.14k £257.01k £217.60k £201.28k £200.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A