THE BOW WATERWORKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supply of potable water to residents of Bow (Devon).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 13 July 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN DAVID MAY | Chair | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAN IVERY CAREW WYLLIE | Trustee | 07 November 2008 |
|
|
||||
MARK EDWARD STANBURY | Trustee | 07 July 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.99k | £11.86k | £16.52k | £13.50k | £6.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.45k | £17.93k | £12.23k | £19.39k | £14.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 23RD NOVEMBER 1858. U. VOL 89 P.280-290 -SCHEME DATED 14TH JUNE 1907, AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07/07/2005
Charitable objects
FOR SUPPLYING THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF BOW WITH WATER FREE OF ANY CHARGE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROWNSLAND
BOW
CREDITON
DEVON
EX17 5AR
- Phone:
- 0136382665
- Email:
- brownsland@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window