Financial history PAKISTANI RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 248685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £41.54k £42.43k £20.04k £48.12k £44.89k
Total expenditure £57.07k £54.12k £54.36k £68.25k £60.77k
Income from government contracts £19.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.50k £19.43k £19.50k £20.20k £20.20k