CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 248781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.19k £6.41k £7.74k £3.76k £3.83k
Total expenditure £24.75k £0 £12.50k £2.75k £7.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A