JOHN KENRICK CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity mostly, but not exclusively, takes requests from the West Midlands
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 03 August 1966: Standard registration
- 18 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.60k | £3.77k | £3.91k | £4.02k | £4.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.70k | £3.35k | £2.20k | £3.80k | £4.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 28 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 01 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 14 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 22 FEBRUARY 1966
Charitable objects
THE PAYMENT OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES THEREOF OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES OR A MAJORITY IN POINT OF NUMBER OF THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window