Trustees OCTAGON THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 248833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Darren John Knight Chair 30 November 2020
THE LOOP DRUG CHECKING SERVICE
Recently registered
LLOYDS BANK FOUNDATION FOR ENGLAND & WALES
Received: On time
SAMEENA HUSSAIN Trustee 30 November 2020
KALA SANGAM
Received: On time
DARK HORSE THEATRE
Received: 46 days late
ESHWAR KUMAR ALLADI Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
FIONA LOIS NODEN Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
MADELINE MURRAY Trustee 15 July 2020
None on record
HELEN BOWDUR Trustee 23 March 2020
None on record
TANIA ANNE LEWYCKYJ-WOOD Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record
IAN TABbRON Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record
STEPHEN ANTHONY YOUNG Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
STEPHEN DAVID PLANT Trustee 26 March 2018
None on record
Lucinda Anne Harvey Trustee 04 December 2017
NORTHERN BROADSIDES THEATRE COMPANY
Received: On time
VICTORIA ELLEN JACKSON Trustee 04 December 2017
None on record
CAROL SOUTHERN Trustee 04 December 2017
None on record