Trustees THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

46 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bishop of London Chair 08 March 2018
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
BISHOP OF LONDON'S FUND
Received: On time
THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF ST KATHARINE
Received: On time
The Venerable Peter James Farley-Moore Trustee 10 April 2022
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Rt Revd Lusa Nsenga-Ngoy Trustee 25 January 2022
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Peter Sinclair Trustee 04 January 2022
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Rev Luke Ijaz Trustee 04 January 2022
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Jacquie Driver Trustee 01 January 2022
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Rev Thomas Watts Trustee 11 November 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Dr Toby Partridge Trustee 29 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Stephen Garside Trustee 29 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Jonathan Wolstenholme Trustee 29 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Ademola Adebajo Trustee 11 October 2021
BETHANY RELIEF AND REHABILITATION INTERNATIONAL (UK)
Received: On time
CHURCH REVITALISATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Rev Matthew Cashmore James Trustee 11 October 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANSELM HAYES
Overdue by 35 days
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Rev Samuel McNally-Cross Trustee 11 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Rev Samuel Follett Trustee 11 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Rev Christopher Phillips Trustee 11 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Rev CHRISTOPHER TRUNDLE Trustee 20 September 2021
CLERKENWELL WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CLERKENWELL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF THE FAITH (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARK, CLERKENWELL
Received: On time
Margarita Ann Barr-Hamilton Trustee 20 September 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Zi Ken Toh Trustee 20 September 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Venerable Catherine Ruth Pickford Trustee 01 September 2020
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
The Venerable Richard Stephen Frank Trustee 20 April 2020
ACTIVATE SPORTS MINISTRY
Received: On time
ST AUGUSTINE'S COMMUNITY CARE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
CHRISTCHURCH FELTHAM
Received: On time
Ven Adam Edward Garnier Atkinson Trustee 23 March 2020
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Dr Joanne Woolway Grenfell Trustee 03 July 2019
TRUST FOR LONDON TRUSTEE
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
RICHARD NICHOLAS PERRY Trustee 06 December 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, TURNHAM GREEN
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Susan Margaret Cooper Trustee 20 November 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, PINNER
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
DIOCESE OF CYPRUS AND THE GULF FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SARAH ROSEMARY ANN FINCH Trustee 20 November 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN, BISHOPSGATE
Received: On time
GLOBAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONFESSING ANGLICANS
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
WYCLIFFE HALL
Received: On time
Kenneth John Riley Trustee 17 October 2018
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Miss A McIntyre Trustee 25 April 2016
THE CHANTRY BOOK
Received: On time
THE WALSINGHAM COLLEGE TRUST ASSOCIATION LTD
Received: On time
MRS S TETT Trustee 07 April 2016
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND EVANGELICAL COUNCIL
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, KENSINGTON
Received: On time
ARCHDEACON OF LONDON Trustee 05 January 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW BY THE WARDROBE, LONDON
Received: On time
STATIONERS' HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
ALDERMAN SAMUEL WILSON FUND
Received: On time
THE CASTLE BAYNARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CLERGY STIPEND TRUST
Received: On time
BISHOP OF LONDON'S FUND
Received: On time
THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Mr J Thomas Trustee 02 November 2015
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
The Revd G Hunter Trustee 20 October 2015
None on record
Archdeacon of Hampstead Trustee 06 October 2015
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE LONDON CLERGY HOLIDAY FUND
Overdue by 858 days
BIshop of Islington Trustee 29 September 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EDMUND THE KING, ST MARY WOOLNOTH AND ST CLEMENT EASTCHEAP
Received: On time
GRATITUDE INITIATIVE
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Dr Phillip Rice Trustee 24 September 2015
None on record
Mr D Hurst Trustee 24 September 2015
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE GREAT COMMISSION TRUST
Received: On time
Bishop of Edmonton Trustee 23 September 2015
ST PETER'S BOURNE MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SCHOOLS
Received: On time
Bishop of Kensington Trustee 23 September 2015
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
ST MELLITUS COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
BISHOP OF FULHAM Trustee 13 September 2013
None on record
THE VERY REVEREND DOCTOR DAVID JOHN ISON Trustee 13 September 2013
ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL CHOIR SCHOOL
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST PAULS
Received: On time
THE ORDER OF THE BRITISH EMPIRE CHAPEL FUND
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
Dr CHRISTOPHER ROY MASON WARD Trustee 13 September 2013
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
CHRISTINA TITILAYO SOSANYA Trustee 13 September 2013
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
INIGO RODNEY MILMON WOOLF Trustee
None on record
CLIVE RICHARD SCOWEN Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH ROXETH (HARROW)
Received: On time
ROXETH YOUTH ZONE
Overdue by 35 days
THE MASENO PROJECT TRUST
Received: On time
LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE CHARLES GARDNER MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
JOSILE WENUS ALEXANDRA MUNRO Trustee
LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
John Ronald Dolling Trustee
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE GATEHILL TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL NORTHWOOD
Received: On time
BRIAN WILLIAM O'DONOGHUE Trustee
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN, BISHOPSGATE
Received: On time
THE GREAT ST HELEN'S TRUST
Received: On time
ELTHAM COLLEGE
Received: On time
GOSPEL PARTNERS TRUST
Received: On time
RENEW CONFERENCE
Received: 1 day late
THE SOLA TRUST
Received: On time