Financial history SOCIETY OF ST AUGUSTINE OF CANTERBURY

Charity number: 249033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £61.50k £39.37k £42.75k £34.75k £30.56k
Total expenditure £53.36k £56.53k £59.61k £58.52k £42.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A