Trustees SOCIETY OF ST AUGUSTINE OF CANTERBURY

Charity number: 249033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARY MOUBRAY GOODWIN Chair 21 May 2014
None on record
Dr Margaret Ann Burgess DCHS Trustee 01 July 2021
THE SUSSEX COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Geraldine Marie Therese Kay Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
CLAUDIA MARY JASPER Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
JOHN DICK Trustee 10 May 2018
THE BRITISH HOSPITALITE TRUST
Received: On time
MARK BENEDICT HOLDEN Trustee 10 May 2018
None on record
CLIONA MARY HOWELL Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record
Priscilla Ann Sharp Trustee 21 May 2014
CATHOLIC UNION CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
ST MARYLEBONE ALMSHOUSES
Recently registered
RICHARD ANTHONY COLLYER-HAMLIN Trustee 17 June 2013
None on record