North Army Trust Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The North Army Trust Fund (NATF) is a Service (Non-Public) Fund. It is maintained to promote the efficiency and well being of units and serving members of the army and their dependants stationed in the 4th Light Brigade Combat Team and Headquarters North East area of responsibility, by providing funds that are available for their overall benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 September 1966: Standard registration
- NORTH EAST ARMY TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- THE NORTH EAST DISTRICT TRUST (Previous name)
- THE SECOND DIVISION (ENGLAND) TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- THE SECOND DIVISION TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Major Harvey See | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colonel David Marshall | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
WO First Class Daniel Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Major Ruaraidh Stewart | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Peter Bruce Stitt | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.72k | £5.47k | £40.00k | £40.31k | £33.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.40k | £17.10k | £38.12k | £104.24k | £38.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME DATED 10 OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY COMMISSION SCHEME DATED 13 FEBRUARY 2012 as amended on 01 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMY BY THE SUPPORT OF ARMY PERSONNEL, AND THEIR FAMILIES, WHO ARE SERVING IN THE DEFINED GEOGRAPHICAL AREA IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA UNDER THE COMMAND OF 15 (NORTH EAST) BRIGADE ON 13 FEBRUARY 2012.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Headquarters Catterick Garrison
Bourlon Barracks
Plumer Road
CATTERICK GARRISON
DL9 3AD
- Phone:
- +443001516937
- Email:
- ANSELM.ALLEN551@MOD.GOV.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window