TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH BROTHER SERVANTS OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN SERVITE FATHERS

Charity number: 249148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV CHRIS OBRIEN Trustee 04 June 1997 None on record
Rev Peter Conniffe Trustee 21 September 2005 None on record
Rev PAUL JOSEPH ADDISON OSM Chair 06 November 2005 None on record
Rev Vincent Coyne Trustee 26 September 2014 None on record
REV PATRICK RYALL Trustee 26 September 2012 None on record
REV Colm McGlynn Trustee 30 May 2017 None on record