Financial history WILTSHIRE CREATIVE

Charity number: 249169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.67m £5.42m £4.76m £4.67m £2.89m
Total expenditure £3.70m £5.64m £4.90m £4.95m £2.73m
Income from government contracts £984.13k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.53m £354.39k £1.48m £1.25m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.11m £2.13m £2.13m £1.63m £2.74m
Income - Other trading activities £270.34k £392.49k £319.04k £364.26k £24.37k
Income - Charitable activities £2.28m £2.73m £2.31m £2.68m £131.72k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £312 £116 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £169.19k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £23.16k £0 £15.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.51m £5.06m £4.66m £4.69m £2.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £187.55k £281.03k £240.88k £12.34k £12.38k
Expenditure - Governance £14.66k £38.99k £22.33k £22.69k £27.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £304.72k £0 £246.86k £101.94k