DANISH YOUNG WOMEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION IN LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's object is to advance the Evangelical-Lutheran faith with the principle aim of offering a Danish support network for young Danes in London in co-operation with the Danish Church in London, based on the Evangelical-Lutheran faith. As part of DSUK the Charity seeks to achieve its aim through providing a Christian home and meeting place for young Danes in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of London
Governance
- 19 October 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEEN ROSENFALCK | Chair | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mads Kjaer Olsen | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karsten Moeller Hansen | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kaare Casper Orlyk | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Sara Kennedy | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jens Ahm | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
NINA JUEL BIGBIE | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARIE MOLLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £465.03k | £259.33k | £329.73k | £429.02k | £485.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £436.16k | £348.89k | £293.83k | £363.96k | £443.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED 4/6/59 AND DEED OF TRUSTS OF 30/9/58 AND 25/4/66 AND CONSTITUTION, ADOPTED 14/3/07, AS AMENDED ON 21/5/13
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EVANGELICAL-LUTHERAN FAITH WITH THE PRINCIPAL AIM OF OFFERING A DANISH SUPPORT NETWORK FOR YOUNG DANES IN LONDON IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE DANISH CHURCH IN LONDON, BASED ON THE EVANGELICAL-LUTHERAN FAITH. AS PART OF DSUK THE CHARITY SEEKS TO ACHIEVE ITS AIM THROUGH PROVIDING A CHRISTIAN HOME AND MEETING PLACE FOR YOUNG DANES AND THROUGH MAKING RESIDENTS AND VISITORS AWARE OF CHURCH SERVICES AND GENERAL PARISH LIFE AT THE DANISH CHURCH IN LONDON
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 MARESFIELD GARDENS
HAMPSTEAD
LONDON
NW3 5TF
- Phone:
- 02074357232
- Email:
- connie@kfuk.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window