FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of fuel or other monetary support to poor of Thursford Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 October 1966: Standard registration
- THURSFORD FUEL ALLOTMENT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher James Rheinberg | Chair | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
William Begg Carter | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy George Bolam | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/02/2020 | 18/02/2021 | 18/02/2022 | 18/02/2023 | 18/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £1.68k | £1.68k | £4.28k | £1.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £1.41k | £1.44k | £4.07k | £2.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 February 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 February 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 February 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 February 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 27TH JULY 1978
Charitable objects
PROVIDING FUEL FOR POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF THURSFORD. IF THE INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED AS AFORESAID IT SHALL BE APPLIED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OF DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
THURSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cottage Farm
Walsingham Road
Thursford
FAKENHAM
Norfolk
NR21 0PB
- Phone:
- 0000
- Email:
- cj.rheinberg@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window