Trustees NORFOLK RECORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 249331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr JOEL ANDREW HALCOMB MPhil, PhD Chair 11 October 2018
None on record
Jonathan Peter Draper BA, PgDip Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Dr ELIZA HARTRICH MA DPHIL Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
PETER JOHN RANDALL STIBBONS Trustee 17 March 2016
NELSON MUSEUM
Received: On time
PASTON HERITAGE SOCIETY LTD
Overdue by 22 days
Gary William Tuson Trustee 19 September 2013
None on record
Dr JEAN HELEN AGNEW BA, PHD Trustee
None on record
DR ALAN METTERS Trustee
None on record
Dr JOHN RICHARD ALBAN BA PHD Trustee
THE NORFOLK ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND HISTORICAL RESEARCH GROUP
Received: On time
NORFOLK ARCHIVES AND HERITAGE DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PATRICK THOMAS RUSSELL PALGRAVE MOORE BA FSA FSG Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR ANTHONY CYRIL HOWE MA, DPHIL Trustee
THE WYNDHAM ASHWORTH ARCHIVE
Received: On time
Charles William Farrow FInstLEx Trustee
SUFFOLK RECORDS SOCIETY
Received: On time
Kristopher David Harper-Allison Trustee
THE NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS BELL RESTORATION FUND
Received: On time
NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS
Received: On time
THE NORTHREPPS BELL MAINTENANCE FUND
Received: On time
ELIZABETH JANE RUTLEDGE LLB Trustee
None on record
Sir Richard Wilson Jewson Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR CAROLE RAWCLIFFE BA PHD Trustee
None on record