Financial history THE ROCHESTER DIOCESAN SOCIETY AND BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £14.42m £13.32m £11.59m £11.77m £11.86m
Total expenditure £11.69m £12.94m £13.29m £12.94m £13.37m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £100.00k £11.99k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.08m £10.77m £10.32m £10.05m £9.91m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £34.00k £19.00k £12.00k £396.00k £478.10k
Income - Endowments £0 £650.00k £0 £21.00k £12.52k
Income - Investment £1.06m £1.13m £1.26m £1.35m £1.48m
Income - Other £3.25m £1.41m £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £650.00k £0 £0 £12.52k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.38m £12.67m £13.04m £12.51m £12.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £310.00k £271.00k £254.00k £432.00k £549.31k
Expenditure - Governance £18.00k £19.80k £20.00k £22.00k £24.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £447.00k £927.00k £1.04m £950.00k £681.40k
Expenditure - Investment management £114.00k £113.00k £112.00k £138.00k £397.32k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0