THE ABBEYFIELD CHIPPENHAM SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supported sheltered accommodation - Dormant
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 September 1966: Standard registration
- 05 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.90k | £74.18k | £75.79k | £70.22k | £71.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.35k | £69.19k | £74.94k | £71.14k | £72.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 15 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 15 March 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION, COMPANY INCORPORATED 18TH APRIL 1966.
Charitable objects
TO HOUSE LONELY OLD PEOPLE WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE ON THEIR OWN. AND IN SO DOING TO PROVIDE A FOCA POINT FOR THE GOODWILL KNIDNESS OF NEIGHBOURS.
Area of benefit
CHIPPENHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window