MRS C J I B GORDON-CANNING'S PRIESTS' TRUST (LONDON)

Charity number: 249432
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £118 £122 £127 £135 £142
Total expenditure £118 £122 £127 £135 £142