Accounts and annual returns THE QUEEN'S ROYAL SURREY REGIMENT COMBINED CHARITIES

Charity number: 249538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 14 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 14 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 02 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 15 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 26 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 26 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2018 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 12 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window