Financial history THE QUEEN'S ROYAL SURREY REGIMENT COMBINED CHARITIES

Charity number: 249538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £46.45k £28.90k £35.32k £33.82k £29.44k
Total expenditure £44.39k £47.53k £26.79k £38.42k £27.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A