Financial history The London Taxi Drivers' Charity for Children

Charity number: 249562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £53.34k £64.27k £60.38k £27.98k £10.84k
Total expenditure £36.31k £55.62k £49.95k £19.61k £7.26k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A