Financial history BLACKPOOL SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS

Charity number: 249596
Charity reporting is up to date (220 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £95.33k £42.69k £501.44k £54.12k £39.04k
Total expenditure £120.43k £133.36k £90.66k £132.07k £97.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £455.29k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £2.07k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £6.58k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £37.50k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £455.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £77.79k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £12.87k N/A N/A