Trustees BLACKPOOL SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS

Charity number: 249596
Charity reporting is up to date (220 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Scholey Chair 18 June 2019
None on record
Kelly Dodgson Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Olivia Grant Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Esme Hinds Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
Samuel Hinds Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Nichola Sharp Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record
Lisa Hinds Trustee 07 May 2013
None on record
MR BOB SHARPLES Trustee
LYTHAM ST ANNES & FYLDE UNIT 227 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Received: On time
JOAN ELLISON Trustee
None on record