THE FREDERICK WIGAN TRUST

Charity number: 249614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 October 2020 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required